MN HF1502 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Scott
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corporate alternative minimum tax and corporate minimum fee repealed.
Title
Corporate alternative minimum tax and corporate minimum fee repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Scott |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1084 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Referred to Taxes