MN HF1501 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer short-term and small loan interest rates regulated.
Title
Consumer short-term and small loan interest rates regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Noor |
2019-02-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Youakim |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1648 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy