MN HF1500 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota identification card requirements modified and related changes made, including eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, voter registration, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota identification card requirements modified and related changes made, including eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, voter registration, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House: (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Passage (Y: 74 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-04-08SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-04-08SenateReceived from House
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Moran
2019-04-05HouseBill was passed as amended
2019-04-05HouseThird reading as amended
2019-04-05HousePoint of order raised, ruled not well taken
2019-04-05HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-04-05HouseAmended
2019-04-03HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 05, 2019
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-08HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Government Operations
2019-03-07HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-04HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-28HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseAuthor added Huot and Bernardy
2019-02-21HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1500&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1500&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1500&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1500&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1500&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF1500&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10119
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF1500&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10120
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF1500&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10122
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF1500&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10124
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF1500&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10125
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF1500&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10121
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF1500&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10123

Bill Comments

feedback