MN HF1500 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota identification card requirements modified and related changes made, including eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, voter registration, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.
Title
Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota identification card requirements modified and related changes made, including eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, voter registration, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Torkelson - Amendment - H1500A24 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Quam - Amendment - H1500A30 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment - H1500A16 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Albright - Amendment to Winkler Amendment - H1500A44 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 74 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Torkelson - Amendment - H1500A24 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Quam - Amendment - H1500A30 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Daudt - Amendment - H1500A16 (Y: 54 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Albright - Amendment to Winkler Amendment - H1500A44 (Y: 54 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-04-05 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2019-04-05 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2019-04-05 | House | Amended |
2019-04-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 05, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-08 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Government Operations |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-04 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Huot and Bernardy |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |