MN HF1496 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Author added Jessup.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Author added Jessup.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Blaine; Trunk Highway 65 congestion and safety improvement study required, and money appropriated.
Title
Blaine; Trunk Highway 65 congestion and safety improvement study required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Nolan West [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Randy Jessup [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Author added Jessup. |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2017-02-23 | House | Author added Koegel. |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1639 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy