MN HF1482 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native American Tourism of Minnesota grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Native American Tourism of Minnesota grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1941 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance