MN HF1481 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Assaulting firefighters or medical personnel enhanced criminal penalties provided.
Title
Assaulting firefighters or medical personnel enhanced criminal penalties provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Taken from table |
2018-05-17 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 125-0 |
2018-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 16, 2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Knoblach. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1871 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Authors added Benson; Ruud