MN HF148 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nonferrous mining permit determinations required before issuance.
Title
Nonferrous mining permit determinations required before issuance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Lillie |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Carlson |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Hassan, Mariani, and Frazier |
2021-02-22 | House | Authors added Liebling and Acomb |
2021-02-11 | House | Authors added Agbaje and Sandell |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Reyer |
2021-02-08 | House | Author added Xiong, T. |
2021-02-04 | House | Authors added Lippert, Bierman, Christensen and Schultz |
2021-01-28 | House | Authors added Feist, Fischer, Boldon, and Her |
2021-01-25 | House | Authors added Jordan, Keeler, Hollins, Wazlawik, and Freiberg |
2021-01-21 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Hornstein, Edelson, Gomez, Pryor, Moller, Hausman, and Long |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF59 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Authors added Eaton; Dibble; Torres Ray; Cwodzinski