MN HF1473 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Igo
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Author added Igo
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
New nuclear power plant certificate of need prohibition abolished.
Title
New nuclear power plant certificate of need prohibition abolished.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Author added Igo |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF225 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Second reading