MN HF147 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Theis
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Community paramedic and community medical response emergency medical technicians allowed to provide telemedicine services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community paramedic and community medical response emergency medical technicians allowed to provide telemedicine services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-01-22HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1073 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback