MN HF1456 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Authors added Rasmusson and Jurgens
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Authors added Rasmusson and Jurgens
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural asset sale beginning farmer tax credit eligibility modified.
Title
Agricultural asset sale beginning farmer tax credit eligibility modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Patricia Mueller [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Authors added Rasmusson and Jurgens |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Haley |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Mueller |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1228 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Author added Westrom