MN HF1433 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Compatibility standard compliance required, minimum ethanol standard modified, technical changes made, and rulemaking required.
Title
Compatibility standard compliance required, minimum ethanol standard modified, technical changes made, and rulemaking required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Elkins |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1178 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy