MN HF1430 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cottage food producer requirements modified.
Title
Cottage food producer requirements modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2021-03-08 | House | Authors added Franson, Lucero, Poston, Gomez and Mekeland |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Mortensen, Hollins and Munson |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Lippert |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1254 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes