MN HF1430 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Agricultural riparian buffer credit established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural riparian buffer credit established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Dettmer
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Lien
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Anderson
2019-02-22HouseReferred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF1937 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback