MN HF1430 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural riparian buffer credit established, and money appropriated.
Title
Agricultural riparian buffer credit established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lien |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Anderson |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1937 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Taxes