MN HF143 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lawful gambling organization annual audit and report requirements modified.
Title
Lawful gambling organization annual audit and report requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Munson |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF197 (Similar To) 2021-01-21 - Author added Kiffmeyer