MN HF1427 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Solar energy use on school building program established.
Title
Solar energy use on school building program established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Pryor |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-08 | House | Authors added Hausman and Feist |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Keeler, Vang, Youakim, Moller |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2144 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Author added Housley