MN HF1424 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Student loan advocate established, licensure of student loan servicers required, certain practices prohibited in student loan servicing, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Student loan advocate established, licensure of student loan servicers required, certain practices prohibited in student loan servicing, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance Division |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-03-28 | House | Authors added Bahner; Becker-Finn; and Xiong, J. |
2019-03-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Authors added Klevorn and Vang |
2019-03-13 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1484 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy