MN HF1422 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Seizure training required in schools.
Title
Seizure training required in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Authors added Anderson, Lee, and Heintzeman |
2020-02-27 | House | Authors added Davnie and Carlson, L. |
2020-02-26 | House | Authors added Hansen, Halverson, Layman, and Masin |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-28 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Olson |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Demuth |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1953 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy