MN HF1420 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans with service-connected disabilities participation in medical cannabis program permitted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans with service-connected disabilities participation in medical cannabis program permitted.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Brand
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-02-28HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF2338 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Bigham

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback