MN HF142 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Counties required to provide pay differential to employees while mobilized in the United States military's reserve component.
Title
Counties required to provide pay differential to employees while mobilized in the United States military's reserve component.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-03-11 | House | Author stricken Dettmer |
2019-03-05 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF274 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy