MN HF1419 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dairy stabilization conservation assistance program established, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dairy stabilization conservation assistance program established, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Pierson
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-02-21HouseReferred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1699 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback