MN HF1418 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Third reading Passed vote: 46-21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Third reading Passed vote: 46-21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lottery prize provisions modified, and State Lottery budget and expenses provided.
Title
Lottery prize provisions modified, and State Lottery budget and expenses provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 46-21 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1573 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1573, now on General Orders |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-05-08 | House | Bill was passed vote: 125-0 |
2017-05-08 | House | Third reading |
2017-05-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 8, 2017. |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2017-02-22 | House | Authors added Johnson, S. |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1573 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1418