MN HF1417 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Pierson
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Qualified business income deduction allowed.
Title
Qualified business income deduction allowed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Pierson |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1967 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Taxes