MN HF1415 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher licensure requirements modified, Professional Educator Licensing and Standards Board composition modified, background check requirements modified, rulemaking authorized, and technical changes made.
Title
Teacher licensure requirements modified, Professional Educator Licensing and Standards Board composition modified, background check requirements modified, rulemaking authorized, and technical changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Policy |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1550 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Author added Wiger