MN HF1403 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnant and postpartum inmate placement in community-based program authorized, and reports required.
Title
Pregnant and postpartum inmate placement in community-based program authorized, and reports required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-04-15 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1315 |
2021-03-10 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Scott |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1315 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Secretary of State Chapter 17 05/13/2021