MN HF1403 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Trade in animal parts prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trade in animal parts prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Mariani, Hornstein, and Dehn
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Lee as chief author
2019-02-21HouseAuthor stricken Wolgamott
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1505 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback