MN HF1400 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing assistant training and competency evaluations reimbursable expense provisions modified.
Title
Nursing assistant training and competency evaluations reimbursable expense provisions modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 71 | |
2017-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2017-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2017-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-0 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1433 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1433, now on General Orders |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2017-05-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 10, 2017. |
2017-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1433 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1400