MN HF140 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Bahr
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Bahr
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hair braiders exempted from cosmetology registration requirements.
Title
Hair braiders exempted from cosmetology registration requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Bahr |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Long |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Garofalo |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Zerwas |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF774 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Author added Westrom