MN HF14 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, July 20, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Corrections and public safety funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections and public safety funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, July 20, 2020
2020-07-14HouseAuthor added Moller
2020-07-14HouseSecond reading
2020-07-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2020-07-13HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF41 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - By Motion, Laid on Table

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback