MN HF1398 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Elkins
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Elkins
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of health and hospitals duties established regarding violence against health care workers in hospitals, and civil and criminal penalties modified.
Title
Commissioner of health and hospitals duties established regarding violence against health care workers in hospitals, and civil and criminal penalties modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1576 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy