MN HF1397 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 22 05/02/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 22 05/02/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Life insurance payments limited for beneficiaries of persons furthering terrorism.
Title
Life insurance payments limited for beneficiaries of persons furthering terrorism.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Secretary of State Chapter 22 05/02/17 | |
2017-05-02 | Governor's action Approval | |
2017-05-02 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-02 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2017-05-02 | Governor approval | |
2017-05-01 | House | Returned from Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1243 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1243, now on General Orders |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-04-24 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 127-2 |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-04-20 | House | Amended |
2017-04-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 20, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Howe. |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1243 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1397