MN HF1394 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Authors added Huot, Hansen, and Kunesh-Podein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Authors added Huot, Hansen, and Kunesh-Podein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chiropractic services coverage under medical assistance and MinnesotaCare modified.
Title
Chiropractic services coverage under medical assistance and MinnesotaCare modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Authors added Huot, Hansen, and Kunesh-Podein |
2020-02-27 | House | Authors added Her, Nornes, and Baker |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lippert |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Pryor |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2341 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy