MN HF1391 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School building bond agricultural credit modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School building bond agricultural credit modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseAuthor added Gruenhagen
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Kresha
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Petersburg, Bennett, Backer, Fabian, Anderson, Gunther, Poston, Lueck, and Daniels
2019-02-19HouseReferred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF1512 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback