MN HF1388 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AIDS drug assistance program coverage modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AIDS drug assistance program coverage modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1136 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback