MN HF1378 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health maintenance organizations required to be nonprofit corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health maintenance organizations required to be nonprofit corporations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF1208 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback