MN HF1375 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Author added Ecklund
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Author added Ecklund
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; ranked-choice voting provided for in federal and state office elections; jurisdictions authorized to adopt ranked-choice voting for local offices; adoption, implementation, and use of ranked-choice voting procedures established; municipalities allowed to use electronic voting systems with reallocation feature; and rulemaking authorized.
Title
Elections; ranked-choice voting provided for in federal and state office elections; jurisdictions authorized to adopt ranked-choice voting for local offices; adoption, implementation, and use of ranked-choice voting procedures established; municipalities allowed to use electronic voting systems with reallocation feature; and rulemaking authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Andrew Carlson [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Carlson |
2022-01-31 | House | Author stricken Ecklund |
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Christensen |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Mariani and Wolgamott |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF1651 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections