MN HF1374 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Chief law enforcement officers required to report peace officer misconduct data to Peace Officer Standards and Training Board, and Sentencing Guideline Commission provisions modified.
Title
Chief law enforcement officers required to report peace officer misconduct data to Peace Officer Standards and Training Board, and Sentencing Guideline Commission provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Luke Frederick [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2021-04-13 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-15 | House | Authors added Lee, Frederick and Reyer |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2152 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy