MN HF1372 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 8:00 am in Basement Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Voters allowed to join permanent absentee voter list, and absentee ballots required to automatically be sent to voters on permanent absentee list before election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voters allowed to join permanent absentee voter list, and absentee ballots required to automatically be sent to voters on permanent absentee list before election.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance Division
2020-02-13HouseReturned by Chair to Government Operations
2019-02-22HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-02-21HouseAuthors changed Dehn and Halverson
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF1410 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback