MN HF1371 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Frazier
Pending: House Workforce Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Comunidades Latinas Unidas En Servicio (CLUES) grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comunidades Latinas Unidas En Servicio (CLUES) grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27HouseAuthor added Frazier
2023-03-01HouseAuthor added Hollins
2023-02-08HouseAuthor added Berg
2023-02-06HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Workforce Development Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2576 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Author added Pappas

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback