MN HF1360 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Author added Youakim
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Safe schools revenue increased, state aid provided, revenue uses expanded to include cyber security measures, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe schools revenue increased, state aid provided, revenue uses expanded to include cyber security measures, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27HouseAuthor added Youakim
2023-02-16HouseAuthor added Pursell
2023-02-06HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF1884 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Author added Gustafson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback