MN HF1355 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Marijuana small amount definition modified, possession of small amount of marijuana law modified, weight of fluids used in water pipes prohibited from being used to determine weight of marijuana mixtures, expungement of records authorized in certain instances, affirmative defense provided, driver's license revocations ended for persons who commit low-level marijuana offenses, and money appropriated.
Title
Marijuana small amount definition modified, possession of small amount of marijuana law modified, weight of fluids used in water pipes prohibited from being used to determine weight of marijuana mixtures, expungement of records authorized in certain instances, affirmative defense provided, driver's license revocations ended for persons who commit low-level marijuana offenses, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] |
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Garofalo |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Long |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added West |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Lee |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2348 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Dziedzic