MN HF1355 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Lippert
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
South St. Paul; women's suffrage monument funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
South St. Paul; women's suffrage monument funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lippert |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-12 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1560 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Capital Investment