MN HF1353 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans' spouses and current military service members' spouses allowed to receive eye movement desensitization and reprocessing therapy through veterans resilience project, veterans resilience project grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' spouses and current military service members' spouses allowed to receive eye movement desensitization and reprocessing therapy through veterans resilience project, veterans resilience project grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01HouseAuthor added Hollins
2023-02-09HouseAuthor added Reyer
2023-02-06HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1509 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Authors added Maye Quade; Housley

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback