MN HF1353 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School counselors allowed to consult with Department of Labor and Industry, and school districts allowed to grant persons promoting skilled trade careers to secondary students.
Title
School counselors allowed to consult with Department of Labor and Industry, and school districts allowed to grant persons promoting skilled trade careers to secondary students.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1588 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Author added Wiger