MN HF1351 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Her
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Author added Her
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul; Hillcrest Golf Course site improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Paul; Hillcrest Golf Course site improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Her |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Fischer |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF1567 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Capital Investment