MN HF1346 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Her
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dakota and Ojibwe indigenous languages recognized in the state of Minnesota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dakota and Ojibwe indigenous languages recognized in the state of Minnesota.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Her
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF1617 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback