MN HF1343 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Author added Pryor
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Author added Pryor
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunscreen possession and use at school provided.
Title
Sunscreen possession and use at school provided.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Pryor |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF629 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy