MN HF1336 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; timeline created for ending restrictions on businesses during the pandemic.
Title
COVID-19; timeline created for ending restrictions on businesses during the pandemic.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Kiel |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lueck |
2021-02-22 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-02-22 | House | Authors added Jurgens, Scott, Daniels |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1200 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Referred to Labor and Industry Policy