MN HF1330 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substance abuse recovery services funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance abuse recovery services funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Gomez
2019-02-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1842 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback